Chen, Hillary Joy (CPSO#: 76412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University Student Health
& Counselling Centre
Prettie Residence
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Droll and Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chen ( CPSO# 76412 )
Dr. K. Droll ( CPSO# 75044 )

Business Address:
Big Thunder Orthopaedic Associates
206 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-1123

Business Address:
Lakehead University Student Health and
Couselling Centre
UC 1007 - 955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILLARY JOY CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004