Chen, Jia-de (CPSO#: 71053)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Swatow


Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 403 - 1100 Sheppard Ave E Toronto, ON M2K 2W1 Tel: 416-222-0660 Fax: 416-222-9238
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request via the fax to 416-222-9238, or via mail to the address above. Patients may also contact the clinic via telephone: 416-222-0660.
Date Received: 30 Jan 2018

Address: Unit 404 1100 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, ON M2K 2W1
Date Received: 08 May 2014


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014