Chen, Joline Ling Tsung (CPSO#: 72301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2004