Chen, Julian Chang-Cheng (CPSO#: 60758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH MRI Health Centre
101-50 Minthorn Blvd
Markham
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Phone: (905) 731-7856
Fax: 905 731 6419
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN CHANG-CHENG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1990