Chen, Julie Yun (CPSO#: 66835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family Medicine & Prim Care
3/F Ap Lei Chau Clinic
161 Main Street
Ap Lei Chau
Hong Kong xxx xxx
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 85225185657
Fax: 85228147475
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bau Institute for Medical and
Health Sciences Education
Room 510, 5/F William MW Mong Block
21 Sassoon Road
Pokfulam xxx xxx
Hong Kong S A R
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 85239179079
Fax: 85228162293
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE YUN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995