Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chen, Li (CPSO#: 58216)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chungking Medical College, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1988