Chen, Lily Furong (CPSO#: 78050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
122 Cornell Park Ave
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY FURONG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004