Chen, Lina (CPSO#: 113603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harbin Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA CHEN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHEN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CHEN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CHEN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017