Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chen, Martin Yung Chieh (CPSO#: 58134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-6861
Fax: (905) 773-2161
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Y. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chen ( CPSO# 58134 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-6861

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN YUNG CHIEH CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988