Chen, Morie Min-Chuan (CPSO#: 76493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Morie Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chen ( CPSO# 76493 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORIE MIN-CHUAN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006