Chen, Richard Chu Tak (CPSO#: 24083)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Durham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 400 71 King Street West Mississauga, ON L5B 4A2
Instructions: Medical records in care of Dr. Carnat
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014