Chen, Robert E Wei (CPSO#: 64219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5207
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen ( CPSO# 64219 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
7 M C 409
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5207

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT E WEI CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1996