Chen, Robert James Boh (CPSO#: 65143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4379
Fax: (613) 761-4925
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen ( CPSO# 65143 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES BOH CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993