Chen, Robert Pao-Chen (CPSO#: 65825)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1992 to 31 Aug 1992
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 May 2007