Chen, Vicky Siu-Ming (CPSO#: 27102)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2016