Chen, Victoria Yi-Shuen (CPSO#: 62379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Y.S. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chen ( CPSO# 62379 )

Business Address:
101 Queensway West
5th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA YI-SHUEN CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991