Chen, Xueyu (CPSO#: 70408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 5-719
Department of Med Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2263
Fax: (416) 946-4467
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Chen ( CPSO# 70408 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
5-719 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2263

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XUEYU CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000