Chen, Yu-Jen Ian (CPSO#: 91669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-8953
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Yu-Jen  Ian Chen may practise paediatrics in Toronto, Ontario, while
                  under supervision  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College,
                  at the following locations:

                  (i)   The Hospital for Sick Children;
                  
                  (ii)  University Health Network - Toronto General Hospital;
                  
                  (iii) The Centre for Addiction and Mental Health; and
                  
                  (iv)  Kindercare/Kid-E-Care.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  will  automatically expire on August 31,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Chen's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Chen's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on July 5, 2013, and will expire on or before
                  August 31, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.