Cheng, Anita King-Lum (CPSO#: 86513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Neonatology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64361
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng ( CPSO# 86513 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Department of Neonatology
800 Commisssioners Road East
D4-200
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA KING-LUM CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011