Cheng, Bai-Sen (CPSO#: 68015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2296 Eglinton Avenue East
unit #4
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M2
Phone: (416) 615-0002
Fax: (416) 285-1169
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bai-Sen Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cheng ( CPSO# 68015 )

Business Address:
4 - 2296 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 615-0002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAI-SEN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996