Cheng, Calvin Kai-Yiu (CPSO#: 59623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: 4162421058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Calvin Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheng ( CPSO# 59623 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALVIN KAI-YIU CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1989