Cheng, Elaine Vivian (CPSO#: 90773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regent Park Community Health Centre
465 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2B2
Phone: 416-364-2261
Fax: 416-364-0822
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Counselling & Psychological Service
University of Toronto
Koffler Student Services Centre
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 416-978-8070
Fax: 416-978-7341
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE VIVIAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011