Cheng, Frederick Hong Tai (CPSO#: 95693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-5342
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cheng ( CPSO# 95693 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-5342

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK HONG TAI CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013