Cheng, Ivy Shu-Shan (CPSO#: 67825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
Emergency Department
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4207
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sports Medicine Specialists
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivy Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cheng ( CPSO# 67825 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital - Emergency Department
C753 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4032

Business Address:
Sports Medicine Specialists
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4S 1E8
Phone Number: (416) 481-1601

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVY SHU-SHAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999