Cheng, Louis Yang Ching (CPSO#: 28627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Queensland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1990