Cheng, Man-Fai Frederick (CPSO#: 73648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Park Medical Centre
2530 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 6W5
Phone: (905) 257-1006
Fax: (905) 257-0661
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAN-FAI FREDERICK CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002