Cheng, Michael King Shan (CPSO#: 69963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KING SHAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001