Cheng, Willoon Wai Ming (CPSO#: 74361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Unit 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheng ( CPSO# 74361 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLOON WAI MING CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 1999 to 21 Nov 1999
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018