Cheong, Li Hsia (CPSO#: 103835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul Street 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-8797
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LI HSIA CHEONG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHEONG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHEONG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHEONG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHEONG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHEONG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHEONG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018