Chepeha, Douglas Brian (CPSO#: 67986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
Head & Neck Surgery 8NU 881
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 946-4629
Fax: (416) 946-2300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas B. Chepeha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chepeha ( CPSO# 67986 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
8th Floor, 8NU 881
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 946-4629

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS BRIAN CHEPEHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEPEHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014