Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chepesiuk, Martin Andrew (CPSO#: 33346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
92 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2K8
Phone: (416) 534-2115
Fax: (416) 533-6791
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin A. Chepesiuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chepesiuk ( CPSO# 33346 )

Business Address:
92 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2K8
Phone Number: (416) 534-2115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ANDREW CHEPESIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEPESIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982