Cherepacha, Douglas Leigh (CPSO#: 66520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 406/408
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 792-2280
Fax: (905) 792-9832
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Cherepacha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cherepacha ( CPSO# 66520 )

Business Address:
408 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 791-3234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LEIGH CHEREPACHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEREPACHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995