Cherian, Alice Thomas (CPSO#: 50394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Grace Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE THOMAS CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987