Cherian, Joe (CPSO#: 68790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 38510
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Canada
Phone: (905) 336-4116
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences Corpn
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joe Cherian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cherian ( CPSO# 68790 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOE CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1996