Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chernick, Elisheva Hava (CPSO#: 60716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
POB 39028
RPO Adelaide Centre
London ON  N5Y 5L1
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Riverside Health Care
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Canada
Phone: (807) 274-4825
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Nelson Medical Clinic
30 Victoria Ave.
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Canada
Phone: (807) 274-3287
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
POB 2007
189 Elm St.
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
POB 2007
189 Elm St.
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. H. Chernick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chernick ( CPSO# 60716 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
89 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
Strathroy-Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
P O Box 39028
RPO Adelaide Centre
London ON  N5Y 5L1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISHEVA HAVA CHERNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERNICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jan 1998 to 04 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990