Chernish, Robert Nicholas (CPSO#: 76356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305-564 Belmont Ave. W.
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 342-0599
Fax: (519) 342-0895
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

911 Queens Blvd.
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6460
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Chernish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chernish ( CPSO# 76356 )

Business Address:
305 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 342-0599

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6460

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NICHOLAS CHERNISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERNISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005