Chernoff, Ian William (CPSO#: 71744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian W. Chernoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chernoff ( CPSO# 71744 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN WILLIAM CHERNOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERNOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998