Chernoff, William Gregory (CPSO#: 58536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chernoff Plastic Surgery
and Laser Center
9002 North Meridian Street
Suite 205
Indianapolis IN  46260
United States
Phone: (317) 573-8899
Fax: (317) 818-2008
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1701 Fourth Street
Suite 100
Santa Rosa CA  95404
United States
Phone: (707) 544-3232
Fax: (707) 936-9260
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 26, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Gregory
            Chernoff, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chernoff
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Chernoff has undertaken not to practice medicine in Ontario until he
                  has:
                  
                        (a)   provided written notice of his intention to return to
                              practice in Ontario not less than 12 weeks prior to his
                              intended return; and
                  
                        (b)   provided written proof acceptable to the College in its sole
                              discretion, that:
                  
                              (i)   the probation status on his medical licenses have been
                                    terminated in both California and Indiana and he does
                                    not currently have any conditions, limits or
                                    restrictions whatsoever on his medical license, or
                                    prescribing privileges in any jurisdiction.
                  
                  Dr. Chernoff has further undertaken to submit to a comprehensive practice
                  assessment within approximately six to twelve months of his return to
                  practice in Ontario and to abide by recommendations flowing from that
                  assessment.