Cherrie, Kenneth Urban (CPSO#: 25018)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1990

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Aug 1990
Summary:

 In August 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cherrie guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Cherrie be reprimanded, and that his licence to practice be 
 suspended for a period of two months.  This suspension was to commence immediately upon the 
 expiration of the six-month suspension period referred to in the Notice of Suspension previously 
 directed to Dr. Cherrie, dated 10 July 1990.  The Committee further ordered that Dr. Cherrie 
 attend before the Discipline Committee for his reprimand on a date to be set by the Registrar 
 prior to the expiry of the above suspension period.  If Dr. Cherrie failed to attend for this 
 reprimand, then the suspension of his licence would continue indefinitely, until such time as the 
 reprimand was administered to him.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Aug 1990


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1990
Summary:

 In June 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cherrie guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within 
 a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his 
 authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Cherrie be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded 
 on the Register.  The Committee also ruled that he be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his 
 licence to practice be suspended upon this Order becoming final, such suspension to continue for 
 six months beyond the date upon which the fine was paid.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jun 1990