Cherry, Richard Andrew (CPSO#: 66388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard A. Cherry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cherry ( CPSO# 66388 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ANDREW CHERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998