Chertkow, Gerald (CPSO#: 13405)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Chertkow at the AIM Health Group 458 Central Avenue London, Ontario N6B 2E5 Tel: (519) 432-1521
Date Received: 15 Dec 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2011