Chertkow, Howard Mark (CPSO#: 30908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lady Davis Institute
Jewish General Hospital
3755 Cote St Catherine Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8260
Fax: (514) 340-8295
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD MARK CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986