Chesine, Stephen Murray (CPSO#: 63853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlingwood Active Care Clinic
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone: (613) 761-6777
Fax: (613) 761-7744
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton University Health Services
Carleton Technology & Training Ctr
Suite 2600
1126 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: (613) 520-4059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Heart of Ottawa Medical Centre
270 Elgin Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 230-8885
Fax: (613) 230-3666
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MURRAY CHESINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992