Cheskes, Sheldon (CPSO#: 54002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 453-1340
Fax: (905) 453-5493
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Cheskes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheskes ( CPSO# 54002 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 453-1340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON CHESKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985