Chesler, Golde (CPSO#: 19769)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1989