Chesney, Alden Egaton (CPSO#: 81853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Chesney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Guyana
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 01 Jul 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Alden Egaton Chesney may practise medicine independently in Hematological
            Pathology, only.