Chesnie, Brian Mark (CPSO#: 30897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2006