Chessex, Noemie (CPSO#: 92717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Division of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chessex & Roussos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chessex ( CPSO# 92717 )
Dr. M. Roussos ( CPSO# 92724 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOEMIE CHESSEX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESSEX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2010