Chetty, Rajendra Muthu (CPSO#: 55307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Patillo Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 2L9
Phone: (519) 727-5500
Fax: (866) 532-9332
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chetty ( CPSO# 55307 )

Business Address:
250 Patillo Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 727-5500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJENDRA MUTHU CHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHETTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987