Chetty, Runjan (CPSO#: 78615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 13 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4902
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Runjan Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUNJAN CHETTY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF LABORATORY MEDICINE AND PATHOBIOLOGY, THE UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. CHETTY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. CHETTY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CHETTY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. CHETTY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. CHETTY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013